Sunday, March 22, 2009

VEDIC MATHS :Trick to Multiply numbers between 11-19

Here are the Rules :
1) prefix the number to be multiplied by zero .
2)The figures in the answer is obtained by adding the units place of number (11-19) with the each figure of the number to be multiplied and adding the sucessive number to it.(this shuold be done similar to our multiplication from right to left)

Example:
`234X111) add zero in front of 234  ------------- 0234X112) the digit in units place of 11 is one and digit sucessive to 4{right most) is zero So do the following (4X1)+0 = 4           0234X11                                             4Now move towards left ,next digit is (3X1)+4 =7      0234X11                                                       74Now move towards left ,next digit is (2X1)+3 =5      0234X11                                                      574Now move towards left ,next digit is (0X1)+2 =2      0234X11                                                     2574`

Isnt it easy and cool?